This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/13/2022 at 22:35:58 (UTC).

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC VS D R HORTON INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/19/2022 PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against D R HORTON INC. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/19/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNYMAC LOAN SERVICES LLC

Defendants

UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIES D

D R HORTON INC

DEER PATH NORTH PROPERTY OWNER

UNKNOWN TENANT IN POSSESSION

HAYDEN, JAMES RICHARD

Not Classified By Court

LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND

CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTAT

HAYDEN

A DELAWARE CORPORATION

INDIVIDUALLY AND AS PERSONAL R

OF THE SUBJECT PROPERTY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

PATEL, PRATIK R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

09/19/2022:NOTICE OF FILING

EFILED SUMMONS

09/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

09/19/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

09/19/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

09/19/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/19/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/19/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

6 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 782883

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/21/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/20/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $1,967.50 Receipt Number XX 782228

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $1,967.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/19/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001954CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/19/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less