This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 03:03:43 (UTC).

PENNY, KENNETH VS MCCAMIS, TIANNA

Case Summary

On 01/25/2019 PENNY, KENNETH filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MCCAMIS, TIANNA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNY, KENNETH

Defendant

MCCAMIS, TIANNA

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT TIANNA MCCAMIS

02/28/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT TIANNA MCCAMIS

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

02/12/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

02/12/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

02/11/2019:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

02/11/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

02/11/2019:MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT TIANNA MCCAMIS

01/31/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT TIANNA MCCAMIS

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

01/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

01/25/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

01/25/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

01/25/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

01/25/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

01/25/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/25/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT TIANNA MCCAMIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT TIANNA MCCAMIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FILING FEES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 395647

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/25/2019
  • Case 422019SC000363SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less