This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:15:22 (UTC).

PENNANT, LLEWELYN VS SOUTHSIDE AUTO SALVAGE AND TOW

Case Summary

On 01/09/2019 PENNANT, LLEWELYN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against SOUTHSIDE AUTO SALVAGE AND TOW. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PENNANT, LLEWELYN

Defendant

SOUTHSIDE AUTO SALVAGE AND TOW

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION DEFTS MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE MOTION TO CONTINUE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

04/16/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION DEFTS MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE MOTION TO CONTINUE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE FILED BY DEFT NATHAN WILLIAM ILLSLEY

04/15/2019:MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE FILED BY DEFT NATHAN WILLIAM ILLSLEY

MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT NATHAN ILLSLEY

04/10/2019:MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT NATHAN ILLSLEY

MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED BY DEFT NATHAN ILLSLEY

04/10/2019:MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED BY DEFT NATHAN ILLSLEY

PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER/NOTICE OF TRIAL

03/19/2019:PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER/NOTICE OF TRIAL

JUDGES WORKSHEET

03/19/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SOUTHSIDE AUTO SALVAGE AND TOWING

01/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SOUTHSIDE AUTO SALVAGE AND TOWING

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

RECEIPT

01/09/2019:RECEIPT

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REG MAIL

01/09/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REG MAIL

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/09/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER DENYING MOTION DEFTS MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE MOTION TO CONTINUE AND MOTION TO DISMISS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO SET HEARING DATE FILED BY DEFT NATHAN WILLIAM ILLSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT NATHAN ILLSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO CONTINUE FILED BY DEFT NATHAN ILLSLEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PRETRIAL CONFERENCE ORDER/NOTICE OF TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $0.30 Receipt Number XX 412695

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $0.30

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 01/28/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT SOUTHSIDE AUTO SALVAGE AND TOWING

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- REG MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Payment received: $192.00 Receipt Number XX 390751

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $175.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/09/2019
  • Case 422019SC000129SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 01/09/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Event Date: 03/19/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less