This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 05/16/2019 at 21:33:38 (UTC).

PC OCALA LLC VS LUCKY, DEVONTE

Case Summary

On 04/23/2019 PC OCALA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against LUCKY, DEVONTE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/23/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PC OCALA LLC

Defendant

LUCKY, DEVONTE

Not Classified By Court

DBA PROMENADE AT OCALA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED DEVONTE LUCKY

05/29/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED DEVONTE LUCKY

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

05/15/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

05/14/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

05/09/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE

05/09/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

05/09/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

ORDER

05/08/2019:ORDER

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR DEVONTE LUCKY

05/06/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR DEVONTE LUCKY

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF PC OCALA LLC

05/06/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF PC OCALA LLC

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT DEVONTE LUCKY

05/02/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT DEVONTE LUCKY

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

04/26/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/24/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/23/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE

04/23/2019:CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

04/23/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/23/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT OF EVICTION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED BY JUDGE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR DEVONTE LUCKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF PC OCALA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT DEVONTE LUCKY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/27/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 04/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 423622

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/23/2019
  • Case 422019SC002022SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/23/2019

    Read MoreRead Less