This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 13:13:53 (UTC).

PC OCALA LLC VS CHAMBERS, CHARMAINE Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/21/2019 PC OCALA LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against CHAMBERS, CHARMAINE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/21/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PC OCALA LLC

Defendants

WILLIAMS, BRIAN

CHAMBERS, CHARMAINE

Not Classified By Court

DBA PROMENADE AT OCALA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT BRIAN WILLIAMS

04/03/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT BRIAN WILLIAMS

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

03/26/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

03/25/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

03/25/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

JUDGES WORKSHEET

03/18/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

ORDER ALLOWING PLTFS ATTORNEY TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

03/11/2019:ORDER ALLOWING PLTFS ATTORNEY TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PLTF PC OCALA LLC

03/08/2019:MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PLTF PC OCALA LLC

NOTICE OF HEARING

03/08/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR BRIAN WILLIAMS

03/07/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR BRIAN WILLIAMS

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CHARMAINE CHAMBERS

03/07/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR CHARMAINE CHAMBERS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

02/27/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/21/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

02/21/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE

02/21/2019:CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

02/21/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/21/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

8 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT CHARMAINE CHAMBERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT BRIAN WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER ALLOWING PLTFS ATTORNEY TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO APPEAR TELEPHONICALLY FILED BY PLTF PC OCALA LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR BRIAN WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
6 More Docket Entries
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Payment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 404194

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • Case 422019SC000939SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/21/2019

    Read MoreRead Less