This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/04/2021 at 22:31:44 (UTC).

PAQUETTE, JUSTIN ROBERT VS SEWNARINE, FANEZA

Case Summary

On 09/10/2021 PAQUETTE, JUSTIN ROBERT filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against SEWNARINE, FANEZA. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/10/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

PAQUETTE, JUSTIN ROBERT

Defendant

SEWNARINE, FANEZA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/14/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

09/10/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

09/10/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

EFILED SUMMONS

09/10/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

09/10/2021:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

09/10/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/10/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 672882

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/10/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001676CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/10/2021

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES