This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 10/27/2019 at 22:31:16 (UTC).

OSTRANDER, SUSAN VS GENE PARKER FARMS LLC Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/03/2019 OSTRANDER, SUSAN filed a Contract - Debt Collection lawsuit against GENE PARKER FARMS LLC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Debt Collection

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OSTRANDER, SUSAN

Defendants

THE ESTATE OF GENE A PARKER

GENE PARKER FARMS LLC

PARKER, KYLE

Not Classified By Court

A NORTH CAROLINA LIMITED LAIBI

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CHAPMAN, AVERY SPENCER

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT GENE PARKER FARMS LLC

10/08/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT GENE PARKER FARMS LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THE ESTATE OF GENE A PARKER

10/08/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THE ESTATE OF GENE A PARKER

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KYLE PARKER

10/08/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KYLE PARKER

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/04/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/03/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/03/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT GENE PARKER FARMS LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THE ESTATE OF GENE A PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KYLE PARKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $1.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/08/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Payment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 471290

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/03/2019
  • Case 422019CA002198CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where a North Carolina corporation is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer CHAPMAN , AVERY S