This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 12:10:54 (UTC).

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC VS MAXEY, TEMEKA

Case Summary

On 01/31/2019 ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against MAXEY, TEMEKA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/31/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

ONEMAIN FINANCIAL GROUP LLC

Defendant

MAXEY, TEMEKA

Not Classified By Court

AS SERVICER FOR ASF WELLS FARG

AS SERVICER FOR ASF WILMINGTON

AS ISSUER LOAN TRUSTEE FOR ONE

ISSUANCE TRUST 2016-2

ISSUANCE TRUST 2018-1

 

Court Documents

MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

04/18/2019:MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

04/12/2019:CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

REPORT-JUDGES WORKSHEET

04/02/2019:REPORT-JUDGES WORKSHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TEMEKA MAXEY

02/12/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TEMEKA MAXEY

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/31/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CIVIL COVER SHEET

01/31/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

01/31/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION TO SET ASIDE DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Reopened for CIVIL OTHER on 04/18/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: ORDER OF DISMISSAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REPORT-JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TEMEKA MAXEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/08/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 02/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/01/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 04/02/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 397245

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/31/2019
  • Case 422019SC000472SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/31/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • Event Date: 04/02/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/18/2019
  • Reopen Date: 04/18/2019; Reopen Reason: Other reason

    Read MoreRead Less