This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/21/2022 at 16:25:17 (UTC).

OLSON, THOMAS VS HEIMLER, ALEX Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/23/2021 OLSON, THOMAS filed an Other lawsuit against HEIMLER, ALEX. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM, HODGES, ROBERT W, ROGERS, STEVEN G and ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/23/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HODGES, ROBERT WILLIAM

HODGES, ROBERT W

ROGERS, STEVEN G

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OLSON, THOMAS

Defendants

HEIMLER, YVONNE

HEIMLER, ALEX

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MORGAN, KEVAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/23/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/23/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

12/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/23/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/29/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/24/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

02/25/2022:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT YVONNE HEIMLER

04/28/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT YVONNE HEIMLER

MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT YVONNE HEIMLER

04/28/2022:MOTION-MOTION TO DISMISS FILED BY DEFT YVONNE HEIMLER

ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

05/18/2022:ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF THOMAS OLSON

06/07/2022:RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY PLTF THOMAS OLSON

REPLY TO PLTFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT YVONNE HEIMLER

06/10/2022:REPLY TO PLTFS RESPONSE TO MOTION TO DISMISS COMPLAINT FILED BY DEFT YVONNE HEIMLER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 702291

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/23/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA002248CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/23/2021

    Read MoreRead Less