This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/12/2019 at 21:34:59 (UTC).

OCALA 1632 LLC VS STEWART, TEASHA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 OCALA 1632 LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against STEWART, TEASHA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

OCALA 1632 LLC

Defendant

STEWART, TEASHA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

04/10/2019:WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

04/09/2019:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

DEFAULT ENTERED

04/03/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF OCALA 1632 LLC

04/02/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF OCALA 1632 LLC

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/02/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR TEASHA STEWART

04/02/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR TEASHA STEWART

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/25/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/21/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

03/19/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE

03/19/2019:CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

03/19/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/19/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • EFILED JUDGMENT TO BE RECORDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT OF POSSESSION FILED BY PLTF OCALA 1632 LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR TEASHA STEWART

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/22/2019
  • Active Process SUMMONS disposition on 03/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 412771

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case 422019SC001312SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less