This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 06/02/2022 at 21:32:14 (UTC).

NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC VS GROVES, SHANEKA

Case Summary

On 05/09/2022 NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against GROVES, SHANEKA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

Defendant

GROVES, SHANEKA

Not Classified By Court

A LIMITED LIABILITY COMPANY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

DAVIS, MICHAEL GEORGE F

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

05/09/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

05/09/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

05/09/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/11/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

05/16/2022:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

05/25/2022:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR SHANEKA GROVES

05/25/2022:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR SHANEKA GROVES

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

05/25/2022:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

05/25/2022:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED

05/31/2022:DEFAULT ENTERED

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR SHANEKA GROVES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY SERVICE AND VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/16/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/13/2022
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 05/13/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/11/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 743018

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/10/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2022
  • DocketCase 422022SC002017SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where NORTHLAND HEATHBROOK LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where A LIMITED LIABILITY CORPORATIO is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MICHAEL GEORGE F DAVIS