This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/02/2019 at 22:31:05 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS .SCHIMBORSKI, JOSEPH T JR Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/09/2019 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against SCHIMBORSKI, JOSEPH T JR. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/09/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

STATE OF FLORIDA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF JOSEPH T SCH

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

.SCHIMBORSKI, JOSEPH T JR

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING I

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT & C

Not Classified By Court

SCHIMBORSKI JR, JOSEPH T.

FLORIDA

INTEREST IN THE PROPERTY HEREI

UNDER OR AGAINST A NAMED DEFEN

OR HAVING OR CLAIMING TO HAVE

DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVIC

FKA NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

10/31/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

CLS: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

10/31/2019:CLS: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

10/02/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE

NOTICE OF HEARING

08/08/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

MOTION-MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

07/24/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR ORDER TO SHOW CAUSE FOR ENTRY OF FINAL JUDGMENT OF MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

DEFAULT ENTERED

07/16/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT WITH ATTACHED RETURNS OF SERVICE

07/10/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT WITH ATTACHED RETURNS OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

07/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

07/10/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $490.00 Receipt Number XX 429181

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/10/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $490.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA001038CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/9/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where FKA NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where FLORIDA TRUSTEE SERVICES LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where BOARD OF COUNTY COMMISSIONERS is a litigant

Latest cases where Clerk of Circuit Court in and for Broward County is a litigant