This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 05/07/2022 at 22:32:24 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS LACKNER, RYAN Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/13/2022 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LACKNER, RYAN. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/13/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS DEVISEES GRA

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF VIRGINIA LAC

LACKNER, RYAN

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CLAIMING B

Not Classified By Court

FKA NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC

DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVIC

DBA SHEL;LPOINT MORTGAGE SERVI

CREDITORS LIENORS AND TRUSTEES

AKA VIRGINIA E LACKNER DECEASE

AKA VIRGINIA E LACKNER

AS POTENTIAL HEIR OF VIRGINIA

AKA VIRGINIA E LACKNER,

AGAINST A NAMED DEFENDANT TO T

OR CLIAMING TO HAVE ANY RIGHT

THE PROPERTY HEREIN DESCRIBED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

VANSLETTE, JASON MICHAEL

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/13/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/13/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

04/13/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

04/13/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE

04/13/2022:CERTIFICATE

EFILED SUMMONS

04/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/13/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

04/21/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

05/24/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

05/24/2022:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF NEWREZ LLC

5 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/21/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketPayment received: $450.00 Receipt Number XX 735509

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/14/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCERTIFICATE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
04/13/2022

DocketCase 422022CA000704CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/13/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less