This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 06/22/2019 at 22:37:19 (UTC).

NEWREZ LLC VS BOURNE, THERESA Et Al

Case Summary

On 05/29/2019 NEWREZ LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against BOURNE, THERESA. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    05/29/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NEWREZ LLC

Defendants

WOODWARD, ANNE

BOURNE, THERESA

STATE OF FLORIDA

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIE

CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN

SMITH, JOHN T

SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY

TETER, RACHEL

Not Classified By Court

AKA MARY TETER DECEASED

GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CRE

AND ALL OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM A

ASSOCIATION INC

ESTATE OF MARY T WISMAN AKA MA

FKA NEW PENN FINANCIAL LLC

COUNTY FLORIDA

DBA SHELLPOINT MORTGAGE SERVIC

DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

Defendant Attorneys

WILLIAMS, REUBEN SHARP

HARRELL, GREGORY CARTER

FOULADI, ANTHONY AMIR

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ANNE WOODWARD

06/19/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ANNE WOODWARD

ANSWER TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND CLAIM ON SURPLUS PROCEEDS FILED BY DEFT SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

06/14/2019:ANSWER TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND CLAIM ON SURPLUS PROCEEDS FILED BY DEFT SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

06/14/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

06/13/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THERESA BOURNE

06/10/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THERESA BOURNE

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

06/10/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RACHEL TETER

06/07/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RACHEL TETER

ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS RACHEL TETER ANN WOODWARD AND THERESA BOURNE

06/07/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS RACHEL TETER ANN WOODWARD AND THERESA BOURNE

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

06/06/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS CONT SEE DOC

06/06/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS CONT SEE DOC

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

06/05/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOHN T SMITH

06/05/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR JOHN T SMITH

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

06/05/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STATE OF FLORIDA DEPARTMENT OF REVENUE

ANSWER FILED BY CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

06/05/2019:ANSWER FILED BY CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/29/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT ANNE WOODWARD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER TO MORTGAGE FORECLOSURE COMPLAINT AND CLAIM ON SURPLUS PROCEEDS FILED BY DEFT SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR SPRUCE CREEK GOLF AND COUNTRY CLUB HOMEOWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT THERESA BOURNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CLERK OF THE CIRCUIT COURT IN AND FOR MARION COUNTY FLORIDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RACHEL TETER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER FILED BY DEFTS RACHEL TETER ANN WOODWARD AND THERESA BOURNE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 06/06/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN HEIRS CONT SEE DOC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $992.50 Receipt Number XX 434059

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $992.50

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/29/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA001151CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 5/29/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less