This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/23/2022 at 22:50:36 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS HARVEST MEADOW HOMEOWNERS ASSO Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/29/2022 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against HARVEST MEADOW HOMEOWNERS ASSO. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/29/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIE

HARVEST MEADOW HOMEOWNERS ASSO

HUMPHREY, MICHELLE RENEE

Not Classified By Court

SPRY, MICHELLE

ASSINEES LIENORS CREDITORS TRU

OTHERS WHO MAY CLAIM AN INTERE

OF KAY H SULLIVAN AKA KAY SULL

DBA MR COOPER

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MEISELS, JONATHAN IAN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/29/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

06/29/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

06/29/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

CERTIFICATE

06/29/2022:CERTIFICATE

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/29/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

06/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/29/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

07/20/2022:AFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/20/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF DILIGENT SEARCH AND INQUIRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $935.00 Receipt Number XX 758134

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/30/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $935.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/29/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001312CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/29/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where MR COOPER is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer Meisels, Jonathan