Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 11/06/2019 at 22:07:15 (UTC).

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC VS COUNTS, ERIC Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/01/2019 NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against COUNTS, ERIC. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/01/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONSTAR MORTGAGE LLC

Defendants

COUNTS, ERIC

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF ERIC COUNTS

UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION

Not Classified By Court

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES OR OTH

UNKNOWN PARTIES MAY CLAIM AN I

ARE NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR AL

IF LIVING AND ALL UNKNOWN PART

DBA MR COOPER

UNKNWON PARTIES MAY CALIM AN I

UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

FISHMAN, BARRY STUART

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

11/01/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

NOTICE OF FILING

11/01/2019:NOTICE OF FILING

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

11/01/2019:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

11/01/2019:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/01/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/01/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Payment received: $440.00 Receipt Number XX 480049

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/04/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF FILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/01/2019
  • Case 422019CA002416CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/1/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where UNDER AND AGAINST THE ABOVE NA is a litigant

Latest cases where MR COOPER is a litigant

Latest cases where Nationstar Mortgage, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer FISHMAN, BARRY STUART