This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/13/2020 at 13:19:48 (UTC).

NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION VS LAKE JOY AND MAGIC LAKE PROPER Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/30/2019 NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against LAKE JOY AND MAGIC LAKE PROPER. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SCOTT, EDWARD L and SCOTT, EDWARD LEON. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SCOTT, EDWARD L

SCOTT, EDWARD LEON

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

NATIONS LENDING CORPORATION

Defendants

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

LAKE JOY AND MAGIC LAKE PROPER

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DALE SULLIVA

RENAUD, CHRISTINA

SULLIVAN, DALE

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTINA RE

Not Classified By Court

AN OHIO CORPORATION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ULLMAN, ZACHARY Y

 

Court Documents

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/30/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT FILED BY DALE SULLIVAN

03/02/2020:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT FILED BY DALE SULLIVAN

15 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FILED BY DEFT FILED BY DALE SULLIVAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN TENANT 2

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN TENANT 1

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR DEFT UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF DALE SULLIVAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT LAKE JOY AND MAGIC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF CHRISTINA RENAUD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/05/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DALE SULLIVAN

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTINA RENAUD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
11 More Docket Entries
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $980.00 Receipt Number XX 495940

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $980.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/30/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002798CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/30/2019

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less