This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/12/2019 at 21:33:48 (UTC).

MURPHY, KRISTIN VS DURDEN, CATRINA

Case Summary

On 03/19/2019 MURPHY, KRISTIN filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DURDEN, CATRINA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/19/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MURPHY, KRISTIN

Defendant

DURDEN, CATRINA

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CATRINA DURDEN

04/03/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CATRINA DURDEN

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

03/20/2019:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/20/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

03/19/2019:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

03/19/2019:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET- EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

03/19/2019:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

EXHIBIT

03/19/2019:EXHIBIT

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

03/19/2019:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

03/19/2019:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/19/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/12/2019
  • WRIT OF POSSESSION ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/12/2019
  • CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT & DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Payment received: $0.45 Receipt Number XX 419884

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/10/2019
  • Assessment 4 assessed at sum $0.45

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT CATRINA DURDEN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
3 More Docket Entries
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EXHIBIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Payment received: $202.00 Receipt Number XX 412759

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • Case 422019SC001309SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less