This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 01:54:58 (UTC).

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC VS RUIZ, GIL Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against RUIZ, GIL. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

Defendants

RUIZ, STEPHANIE

RUIZ, GIL

Not Classified By Court

DBA MUNROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

03/27/2019:CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

03/27/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

03/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

03/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

AFFIDAVIT IN VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

03/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT IN VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

03/19/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

JUDGES WORKSHEET

03/05/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEPHANIE RUIZ

02/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEPHANIE RUIZ

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GIL RUIZ

02/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GIL RUIZ

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

01/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/03/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CLS: FINAL JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF NON MILITARY SERVICE AND PROPER VENUE FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT IN VERIFICATION OF CLAIM FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/19/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS AND INTEREST FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR STEPHANIE RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/21/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GIL RUIZ

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/08/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 01/08/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 03/05/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 388360

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case 422019SC000031SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Event Date: 03/05/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less