This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/07/2019 at 23:32:16 (UTC).

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC VS MOORE, JULIE LANETTE

Case Summary

On 03/14/2019 MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MOORE, JULIE LANETTE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

Defendant

MOORE, JULIE LANETTE

Not Classified By Court

DBA MUNROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JULIE LANETTE MOORE

05/10/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT JULIE LANETTE MOORE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

04/08/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

04/08/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

CERTIFICATE-SIGNATURE CERTIFICATE

04/08/2019:CERTIFICATE-SIGNATURE CERTIFICATE

SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

04/02/2019:SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/14/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

03/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/14/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION-SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 411119

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/14/2019
  • Case 422019CC000302CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less