This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 02:04:16 (UTC).

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC VS BOUIE, LARKISHA

Case Summary

On 01/03/2019 MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOUIE, LARKISHA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/03/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

Defendant

BOUIE, LARKISHA

Not Classified By Court

DBA MUNROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

03/18/2019:ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

MISC

03/18/2019:MISC

ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2019:ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

03/13/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

03/11/2019:MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

ORDER

03/05/2019:ORDER

JUDGES WORKSHEET

03/05/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR LARKISHA BOUIE

02/21/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR LARKISHA BOUIE

SUMMONS ISSUED

01/03/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

01/03/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

01/03/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER APPOINTING PROCESS SERVER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MISC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ALIAS SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 05/21/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 410951

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT PROCESS SERVER FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • JUDGES WORKSHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
2 More Docket Entries
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 03/05/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Payment received: $185.00 Receipt Number XX 388316

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/03/2019
  • Case 422019SC000026SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/3/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/21/2019
  • Event Date: 05/21/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/05/2019
  • Event Date: 03/05/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less