This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 13:36:16 (UTC).

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC VS ARMSTRONG, HEATHER B Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/27/2019 MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against ARMSTRONG, HEATHER B. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/27/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLC

Defendants

ARMSTRONG, IRA

ARMSTRONG, HEATHER B

Not Classified By Court

DBA MUNROE REGIONAL MEDICAL CE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

LOTANE, TROY R

 

Court Documents

AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLS

09/24/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLS

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLS

09/24/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF MUNROE HMA HOSPITAL LLS

MOTION-SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

05/09/2019:MOTION-SETTLEMENT AGREEMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

05/14/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

JUDGES WORKSHEET

05/01/2019:JUDGES WORKSHEET

ORDER OF DISMISSAL

05/14/2019:ORDER OF DISMISSAL

FINAL JUDGMENT

10/03/2019:FINAL JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

10/03/2019:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE

AFFIDAVIT IRA ARMSTRONG

04/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT IRA ARMSTRONG

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

04/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

AFFIDAVIT HEATHER ARMSTORNG

04/17/2019:AFFIDAVIT HEATHER ARMSTORNG

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

04/17/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

AFFIDAVIT HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

04/17/2019:AFFIDAVIT HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/27/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

02/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

02/27/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

02/27/2019:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT IRA ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT HEATHER ARMSTORNG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AFFIDAVIT HEATHER B ARMSTRONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 03/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/02/2019
  • Active Process PTC disposition on 03/02/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Event SC PTC scheduled on 05/07/2019 at 1230 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 406092

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/27/2019
  • Case 422019SC001020SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/27/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2019
  • Event Date: 05/07/2019 12:30; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: XX COURTROOM 1A

    Read MoreRead Less