This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 11/06/2022 at 22:30:55 (UTC).

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC VS CARUTHERS, JILL Et Al

Case Summary

On 10/14/2022 MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against CARUTHERS, JILL. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    10/14/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORTGAGE ASSETS MANAGEMENT LLC

Defendants

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

THE UNKNOWN HEIRS BENEFICIARIE

CARUTHERS, JILL

PELSKI, JEANNE

FOUST, JULIE

Not Classified By Court

ON BEHALF OF THE SECRETARY OF

DEVELOPMENT

FKA REVERSE MORTGAGE SOLUTIONS

LIENORS CREDITORS TRUSTEES AND

CLAIM AN INTEREST IN THE ESTAT

DECEASED

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

STARASOLER, TRACY

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

10/14/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

10/14/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

EFILED LIS PENDENS

10/14/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

10/14/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

10/14/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

10/18/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 015 4 CERTIFICATION FILED BY PLTF

10/14/2022:NOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 015 4 CERTIFICATION FILED BY PLTF

DISCLAIMER BY CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

10/31/2022:DISCLAIMER BY CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

4 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/31/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDISCLAIMER BY CONDITIONAL DISCLAIMER OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $955.00 Receipt Number XX 789585

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/17/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SUBMITTING FLA STAT 702 015 4 CERTIFICATION FILED BY PLTF

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketFiler Selected Confidentiality Flag: . NoConfidentialInformation

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $955.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/14/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA002167CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 10/14/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less