This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 12:20:54 (UTC).

MORALES, CARMELO VS IHRIG, SIERRA Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/10/2019 MORALES, CARMELO filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against IHRIG, SIERRA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/10/2019

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MORALES, CARMELO

Defendants

WITHEY, DUSTIN

IHRIG, SIERRA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

KELLEY, JERRON LEON

 

Court Documents

NOTICE- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

01/10/2020:NOTICE- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

DEFAULT ENTERED

01/02/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

12/27/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

12/27/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR SIERRA IHRIG

12/27/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR SIERRA IHRIG

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR DUSTIN WITHEY

12/27/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR DUSTIN WITHEY

MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

12/27/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

12/27/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

12/16/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

12/10/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

12/10/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

12/10/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/10/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/10/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE- NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY STATUS FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR SIERRA IHRIG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR DUSTIN WITHEY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FOR FINAL JUDGMENT FOR EVICTION FILED BY PLTF CARMELO MORALES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/13/2019
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 12/13/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $205.00 Receipt Number XX 490770

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $205.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2019
  • DocketCase 422019SC005626SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/10/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer KELLEY JERRON