This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 19:03:08 (UTC).

MOORE, JASON ISAAC VS MOORE, TERICA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 MOORE, JASON ISAAC filed a Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce lawsuit against MOORE, TERICA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Family - Marriage Dissolution/Divorce

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

MOORE, JASON ISAAC

Respondent

MOORE, TERICA

Not Classified By Court

KEENE, TERICA

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/13/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF CORROBORATING WITNESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketJudge: CRAGGS , ANN MELINDA Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY ORDER NOTICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSTANDING FAMILY LAW COURT ORDER WITHOUT CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF COMPLIANCE WITH MANDATORY DISCLOSURE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCOPY OF FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF SOCIAL SECURITY NUMBER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketDISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT OF MILITARY SERVICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED TO TERICA MOORE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR DOM WITH NO PROPERTY OR CHILDREN

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $418.00 Receipt Number XX 566132

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $408.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020DR003085DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less