Search

Attributes

This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 12/01/2019 at 22:30:55 (UTC).

MOORE, DONALD VS ANY UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSIO Et Al

Case Summary

On 11/07/2019 MOORE, DONALD filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSIO. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/07/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOORE, DONALD

Defendants

ANY UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSIO

ARTER, ERNEST

ARTER, LAURA K

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

TRENTELMAN, JOHN CHRISTOPHER

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

02/17/2020:NOTICE OF HEARING

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

02/17/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY OF DEFT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION ONLY

01/14/2020:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY OF DEFT UNKNOWN PARTIES IN POSSESSION ONLY

MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

02/12/2020:MOTION FOR SUMMARY JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS ERNEST R ARTER AND LAURA K ARTER

11/27/2019:ANSWER FILED BY DEFTS ERNEST R ARTER AND LAURA K ARTER

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

02/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

02/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

02/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

02/12/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

05/26/2020:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF HEARING

CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT

05/14/2020:CLS:FORECLOSURE FINAL JUDGMENT

NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

08/06/2020:NOTICE OF SALE CHECK LIST

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEBTORS ERNEST RAY ARTER AND LAURA KAY ARTER

05/22/2020:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY FILED BY DEBTORS ERNEST RAY ARTER AND LAURA KAY ARTER

ORIGINAL CONTRACT FOR DEED - ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

05/14/2020:ORIGINAL CONTRACT FOR DEED - ATTACHED TO NOTICE OF FILING

CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DONALD MOORE

05/14/2020:CORR/MEMO TO JUDGES OFFICE FILED BY DONALD MOORE

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

05/14/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM

AFFIDAVIT AMENDED OF AMOUNT DUE FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

05/06/2020:AFFIDAVIT AMENDED OF AMOUNT DUE FILED BY PLTF DONALD MOORE

AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

03/23/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF HEARING

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR UNKNOWN PARTY IN POSSESSION

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ERNEST R ARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR LAURA K ARTER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMISC- FORECLOSURE CASES(HOMESTEAD PROPERTY) PLTF/LENDER REQUIRED INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATION AS TO CONTRACT FOR DEED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 481395

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 11/07/2019
  • DocketCase 422019CA002445CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/7/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases represented by Lawyer TRENTELMAN, JOHN CHRISTOPHER