This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 09/03/2019 at 14:44:33 (UTC).

MONTERO, MONICA G VS POND, KEITH ALLEN

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 MONTERO, MONICA G filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against POND, KEITH ALLEN. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are HERNDON, LISA and HODGES, ROBERT W. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

HERNDON, LISA

HODGES, ROBERT W

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MONTERO, MONICA G

Defendant

POND, KEITH ALLEN

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SMITH, MICHAEL JAMES

 

Court Documents

ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

01/09/2020:ORDER SETTING PRETRIAL CONFERENCE AND JURY TRIAL

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/10/2019:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

12/10/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

12/10/2019:AMENDED NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

NOTICE-NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

01/03/2020:NOTICE-NOTICE AT ISSUE AND REQUEST TO DOCKET FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

01/10/2020:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION FROM NON PARTY

REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF MONICA G. MONTERO

01/13/2020:REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF MONICA G. MONTERO

WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF MONICA MONTERO

05/01/2020:WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTF MONICA MONTERO

EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

04/16/2020:EXPERT WITNESS DISCLOSURE FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECON D FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

01/13/2020:REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECON D FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

02/10/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION

02/05/2020:CERTIFICATE OF AUTHORITY FOR MEDIATION

NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

01/06/2020:NOTICE OF TAKING DEPOSITION

ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE-AND MEDIATION ORDER

01/07/2020:ORDER SETTING CASE MANAGEMENT CONFERENCE-AND MEDIATION ORDER

MOTION-STIPULATION FOR SETTING TRIAL

01/09/2020:MOTION-STIPULATION FOR SETTING TRIAL

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/25/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/25/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

9 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY PLTF MONICA G MONTERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY PLTF MONICA MONTERO

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/11/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFT KEITH ALLEN POND

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER GRANTING DEFENDANTS JOINT STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • STIPULATION TO SET ASIDE DEFAULT FILED BY PLTF AND DEFT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DEFAULT ENTERED

    Read MoreRead Less
5 More Docket Entries
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case 422019CA000924CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less