This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 07/26/2020 at 19:02:20 (UTC).

MOLINA, ARLENE, OCASIO MARRERO, EMMANUEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/02/2020 MOLINA, ARLENE, OCASIO MARRERO, EMMANUEL was filed as a Family - Other Family lawsuit. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA and ANN CRAGGS. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/02/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Family - Other Family

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

ANN CRAGGS

 

Party Details

Respondent

OCASIO MARRERO, EMMANUEL

Not Classified By Court

MOLINA, ARLENE

OCASIO, ARLENE

SANTOS, ARLENE

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketCLS: NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/13/2020
  • DocketUpdated Event INJUNCTION HRG on 07/16/2020 0830 AM - REMOVED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/09/2020
  • DocketSHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE ON 7/8/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/08/2020
  • DocketActive Process DOMESTIC VIOLENCE disposition on 07/08/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketORDER SETTING HEARING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketEvent INJUNCTION HRG scheduled on 07/16/2020 at 0830 AM - Judge ANN CRAGGS presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketNOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketINFORMATION FOR SERVING RSPT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketFAMILY LAW FINANCIAL AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketUCCJEA AFFIDAVIT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketCase 422020DR002182DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 07/02/2020

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/02/2020
  • DocketJudge: CRAGGS , ANN MELINDA assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less