This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 02/21/2022 at 07:12:52 (UTC).

MOHAMED, ABID VS ALL CLAIMANTS PERSONS PARTIES Et Al

Case Summary

On 08/13/2021 MOHAMED, ABID filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against ALL CLAIMANTS PERSONS PARTIES. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    08/13/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MOHAMED, ABID

Defendants

ALL UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSONS

THE SEVERAL AND RESPECTIVE UNK

ALL CLAIMANTS PERSONS PARTIES

LOUISMA, JEAN

LOUISMA, ALICE

UNITED STATES OF AMERICA DEPAR

Not Classified By Court

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD OR NOT KN

ALIVE THEIR SEVERAL AND RESPEC

HEIRS DEVISEES GRANTEES AND CR

PARTIES CLAIMING BY THROUGH OR

UNKNOWN NATURAL PERONS

SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST TRUSTEE

PERSON OR ENTITY CLAIMING BY T

AGAINST ANY ENTITY NAMED AS A

OR WHOSE EXACT LEGAL STATUS IS

UNDER ANY OF THE ABOVE NAMED O

DEFENDANTS OR PARTIES OR CLAIM

RIGHT TITILE OR INTEREST IN TH

DESCRIBED

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, ROBERT DOUGLAS

Defendant Attorney

MCGRAW, JON INGRAM

 

Court Documents

CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: NOTICE OF ACTION PUBLICATION DATES

12/17/2021:CLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: NOTICE OF ACTION PUBLICATION DATES

OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

12/15/2021:OATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

12/15/2021:ANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

12/13/2021:ORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

12/08/2021:PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

12/07/2021:MOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

10/28/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS PROCESS

10/28/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS PROCESS

DEFAULT ENTERED

10/28/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

10/21/2021:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

10/18/2021:EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

10/18/2021:EFILED INTO INCORRECT CASE

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF JOE RANDALL DAVIS

10/18/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE FILED BY PLTF JOE RANDALL DAVIS

RETURN OF SERVICE ATTEMPTED ON ALICE LOUISMA ON SEPTEMBER 22ND 2021

10/18/2021:RETURN OF SERVICE ATTEMPTED ON ALICE LOUISMA ON SEPTEMBER 22ND 2021

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

10/15/2021:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JEAN LOUISMA

10/13/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JEAN LOUISMA

DISCLAIMER BY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

09/27/2021:DISCLAIMER BY OF THE UNITED STATES OF AMERICA

AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE OF 28 USC SECTION 2410 FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

09/24/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF COMPLIANCE OF 28 USC SECTION 2410 FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

16 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/17/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCLERKS CERTIFICATE RE: NOTICE OF ACTION PUBLICATION DATES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketOATH OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER OF ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER APPOINTING ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION TO APPOINT ATTORNEY AD LITEM GUARDIAN AD LITEM AND ADMINISTRATOR AD LITEM FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR MAILING NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILINGS PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/28/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 10/21/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF ABID MOHAMED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
12 More Docket Entries
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $430.00 Receipt Number XX 664410

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $430.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/13/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001497CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 8/13/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less