This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/21/2022 at 11:17:25 (UTC).

MIRANDA, DORIS VS GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE

Case Summary

On 11/05/2021 MIRANDA, DORIS filed an Other lawsuit against GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR and MCCUNE, R JAMES. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/05/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

MCCUNE, ROBERT JAMES JR

MCCUNE, R JAMES

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIRANDA, DORIS

Defendant

GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

EISENSTEIN, NATHALIE

Defendant Attorney

WORLEY, STEVEN L

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/05/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

11/05/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

11/05/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

11/05/2021:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

11/05/2021:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

11/05/2021:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/05/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DORIS MIRANDA

11/15/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DORIS MIRANDA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

11/15/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PLTF DORIS MIRANDA

11/15/2021:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PLTF DORIS MIRANDA

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/06/2021:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

12/29/2021:MOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

01/18/2022:CASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCASE MANAGEMENT ORDER

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/29/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION FOR EXTENSION OF TIME FILED BY DEFT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY PLTF DORIS MIRANDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR GEOVERA SPECIALTY INSURANCE COMPANY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY PLTF DORIS MIRANDA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $410.00 Receipt Number XX 688486

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $410.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/05/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CC001503CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/5/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where GeoVera Specialty Insurance Company is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer WORLEY STEVEN L