This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/19/2019 at 22:31:34 (UTC).

MINOR, K.W Et Al VS ALVAREZ, LUIS A Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/25/2019 MINOR, K W filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ALVAREZ, LUIS A. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/25/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

WILSON, LISA

WILSON, CALEB

MINOR, K.W

WILSON, CHRISTIANNE

Defendants

ALVAREZ, LUIS A

AMSPOKER SERVICES CORPORATION

Not Classified By Court

DBA PROFESSIONAL CARPET SYSTEM

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

HEVIA, ANTHONY CARLOS

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

09/16/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

09/16/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

09/16/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF LISA WILSON

08/29/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY PLTF LISA WILSON

NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFTS

09/09/2019:NOTICE OF COMPLIANCE WITH REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFTS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

09/27/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFTS

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS

09/27/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFTS

DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES FILED BY DEFTS LUIS ALBERTO ALVAREZ AND AMSPOKER SERVICES CORPORATION

06/19/2020:DESIGNATION OF EXPERT WITNESSES FILED BY DEFTS LUIS ALBERTO ALVAREZ AND AMSPOKER SERVICES CORPORATION

WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTFS LISA WILSON CALEB WILSON KW AND CHRISTIANNE WILSON

06/22/2020:WITNESS LIST FILED BY PLTFS LISA WILSON CALEB WILSON KW AND CHRISTIANNE WILSON

AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

06/25/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT

06/25/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT

06/25/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT

06/25/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT

06/25/2020:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF LISA WILSON

06/26/2020:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF LISA WILSON

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS- AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Payment received: $20.00 Receipt Number XX 425470

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Payment received: $400.00 Receipt Number XX 424204

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/25/2019
  • Case 422019CA000917CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/25/2019

    Read MoreRead Less