This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 03/05/2019 at 13:04:47 (UTC).

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC VS MARTINEAU, JEFFREY

Case Summary

On 01/22/2019 MIDLAND FUNDING LLC filed an Other lawsuit against MARTINEAU, JEFFREY. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/22/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

Defendant

MARTINEAU, JEFFREY

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

OBI, VALERIA I.

 

Court Documents

CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

05/26/2020:CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM

MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

05/06/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

05/26/2020:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

05/26/2020:CONTINUING WRIT OF GARNISHMENT

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

05/09/2019:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT

FACT INFORMATION SHEET

05/09/2019:FACT INFORMATION SHEET

NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLTF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

07/28/2020:NOTICE OF GARNISHMENT FILED BY PLTF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

06/01/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

06/01/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

03/14/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY FILED BY PLTF MIDLAND FUNDING LLC

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

03/14/2019:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLNTF MIDLAND FUDNING

04/18/2019:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLNTF MIDLAND FUDNING

DEFAULT ENTERED

03/19/2019:DEFAULT ENTERED

AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY PATSY PELLEGRINI

04/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT NON MILITARY PATSY PELLEGRINI

AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLNTF MIDLAND FUDNING

04/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF COSTS FILED BY PLNTF MIDLAND FUDNING

AFFIDAVIT OF DONNA JARVE

05/09/2019:AFFIDAVIT OF DONNA JARVE

AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLNTF MIDLAND FUDNING

04/18/2019:AFFIDAVIT FILED BY PLNTF MIDLAND FUDNING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JEFFREY MARTINEAU

01/29/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JEFFREY MARTINEAU

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 01/29/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR JEFFREY MARTINEAU

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/23/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Payment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 394156

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/22/2019
  • Case 422019CC000070CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/22/2019

    Read MoreRead Less