This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 02/22/2022 at 21:20:19 (UTC).

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC VS HOPKINS, ROSALYN

Case Summary

On 11/15/2021 MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HOPKINS, ROSALYN. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT, LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    11/15/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MIDLAND CREDIT MANAGEMENT INC

Defendant

HOPKINS, ROSALYN

Ocala, FL 34475-6246

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WHITE, RACQUEL ANN

Defendant Attorney

DAUTA, OMAIRA PATRICIA

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

11/15/2021:CIVIL COVER SHEET

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

11/15/2021:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

EFILED SUMMONS

11/15/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

11/22/2021:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROSALYN HOPKINS

12/06/2021:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROSALYN HOPKINS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ROSALYN HOPKINS

12/09/2021:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ROSALYN HOPKINS

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL SET FOR JANUARY 4 2022 AT 1PM

01/03/2022:NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL SET FOR JANUARY 4 2022 AT 1PM

JUDGES WORKSHEET

01/04/2022:JUDGES WORKSHEET

JUDGES WORKSHEET

02/01/2022:JUDGES WORKSHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 02/07/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event SC PTC on 02/01/2022 0100 PM - CASE CLOSED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 02/01/2022 13:00; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR; Defendant Attorney: DAUTA, OMAIRA P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/01/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGES WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 02/01/2022 at 0100 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/20/2022
  • DocketUpdated Event SC PTC on 01/04/2022 0100 PM - CONTINUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • HearingEvent Date: 01/04/2022 13:00; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR; Defendant Attorney: DAUTA, OMAIRA P

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/04/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketJUDGES WORKSHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 01/03/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT AND NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF PRETRIAL SET FOR JANUARY 4 2022 AT 1PM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/09/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT ROSALYN HOPKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • DocketActive Process PTC disposition on 12/06/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 12/06/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR ROSALYN HOPKINS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 01/04/2022 at 0100 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/22/2021
  • DocketJudge: LANDT , ROBERT E Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/16/2021
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number XX 691180

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 11/15/2021
  • DocketCase 422021SC004987SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 11/15/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less