This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/18/2019 at 22:32:20 (UTC).

MEYERS, JAMES Et Al VS CUMMINGS, THELMA DE LA CRUZ Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/24/2019 MEYERS, JAMES filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against CUMMINGS, THELMA DE LA CRUZ. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/24/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MEYERS, JAMES

MEYERS, MONIKA

Defendants

CUMMINGS, THELMA DE LA CRUZ

UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASS

Not Classified By Court

AKA USAA CASUALTY INSURANCE CO

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLAK, NORMAN C.

 

Court Documents

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

07/31/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

ORDER OF DISMISSAL-RECORDED

01/23/2020:ORDER OF DISMISSAL-RECORDED

FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF JAMES MEYERS AND MONIKA MEYERS

01/23/2020:FINAL DISPOSITION FORM FILED BY PLTF JAMES MEYERS AND MONIKA MEYERS

NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

10/04/2019:NOTICE OF PRODUCTION NON-PARTY FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

08/30/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

10/04/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE SECOND FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL EXPENSES AND COLLATERAL SOURCES FILED BY PLTFS JAMES MEYERS AND MONIKA MEYERS

07/31/2019:MOTION IN LIMINE REGARDING EVIDENCE OF MEDICAL EXPENSES AND COLLATERAL SOURCES FILED BY PLTFS JAMES MEYERS AND MONIKA MEYERS

ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS BAD FAITH CLAIM

07/30/2019:ORDER GRANTING MOTION TO DISMISS BAD FAITH CLAIM

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MONIKA MEYERS

09/26/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF MONIKA MEYERS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

08/30/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

10/31/2019:PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

10/29/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JAMES MEYERS

10/16/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JAMES MEYERS

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

06/05/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

05/29/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

06/05/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

06/05/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION

ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

06/05/2019:ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS AMENDED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • AMENDED PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Payment received: $10.00 Receipt Number XX 430228

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/14/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $10.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED UNITED SERVICES AUTOMOBILE ASSOCIATION AKA USAA CASUALTY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED THELMA DE LAW CRUZ CUMMINGS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 424032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/24/2019
  • Case 422019CA000912CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/24/2019

    Read MoreRead Less