This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/16/2022 at 22:32:23 (UTC).

MERCADO, DAVID VS IKAIKA ARRUDA, KIMO Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/23/2022 MERCADO, DAVID filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against IKAIKA ARRUDA, KIMO. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/23/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MERCADO, DAVID

Defendants

UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA I

IKAIKA ARRUDA, KIMO

Not Classified By Court

DBA UNITED RENTALS A FOREIGN P

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

GOSS, ADY A.

Defendant Attorney

DOW, RANDY RICHARD

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

06/23/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

EFILED SUMMONS

06/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/23/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/23/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

06/23/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

06/23/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

06/23/2022:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/23/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

06/23/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/24/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC AND KIMO IKAIKA ARRUDA

07/12/2022:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC AND KIMO IKAIKA ARRUDA

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC AND KIMO IKAIKA ARRUDA

07/12/2022:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC AND KIMO IKAIKA ARRUDA

2 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF APPEARANCE FILED BY DEFTS UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC AND KIMO IKAIKA ARRUDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 07/12/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS UNITED RENTALS NORTH AMERICA INC AND KIMO IKAIKA ARRUDA

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST TO PRODUCE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 756575

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/23/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA001271CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/23/2022

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where United Rentals, Inc, is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer ADY GOSS