This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 03/06/2022 at 22:35:13 (UTC).

MCCULLUM, ROBIN Et Al VS GALLERY, GERALD D

Case Summary

On 02/10/2022 MCCULLUM, ROBIN filed an Other lawsuit against GALLERY, GERALD D. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN and ROGERS, STEVEN G. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/10/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROGERS, STEVEN GLEN

ROGERS, STEVEN G

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

MUMAW, RICHARD B

MCCULLUM, ROBIN

Defendants

GALLERY, GERALD D

MOUREY, PHINEAS M

MOUREY, MAGGIE B

LITTLE, CHARLES C

HAYMOND, MARJORIE B

HAYMOND, ARNOLD CLAY

MUMAW, HERBERT H

MUMAW, BETTY J

Not Classified By Court

SPRANGER, ROBIN

AS SUCCESSOR TRUSTEES OF THE M

DATED MARCH 13 2007,

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD HIS UNKNO

SUCCESSORS AND ALL PARTIES CLA

UNDER OR AGAINST HIM,

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD HER UNKNO

UNDER OR AGAINST HER,

UNDER OR AGINST HIM,

UNDER OR AGINST HER,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALLAWAY, LAWRENCE C

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

02/10/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/10/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE

02/10/2022:NOTICE

EFILED SUMMONS

02/10/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/15/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

02/15/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2022

DocketPayment received: $417.50 Receipt Number XX 716304

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/11/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketNOTICE

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $417.50

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
02/10/2022

DocketCase 422022CA000259CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/10/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less