This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 07/16/2022 at 22:35:31 (UTC).

MARCO POLO BUILDERS INC VS BALL ESTEROS, JOSE Et Al

Case Summary

On 06/22/2022 MARCO POLO BUILDERS INC filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against BALL ESTEROS, JOSE. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/22/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCO POLO BUILDERS INC

Defendants

Kingsland INC

BALL ESTEROS, JOSE

LEACH, JOE

KINGSLAND COUNTRY PROPERTY OWN

KINGSLAND OCALA WATERWAY OWNER

METROPOLITAN BANK AND TRUST CO

Not Classified By Court

A FLORIDA CORPORATION

BALLESTEROS, JOSE

IF ALIVE AND IF DEAD HIS UNKNO

GRANTEES AND ALL OTHER PARTIES

UNDER OR AGAINST HIM,

AN ILLINOIS CORPORATION

A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT CORPO

KINGSLAND PROPERTY OWNERS ASSO

A FLORIDA NOT FOR PROFIT ASSOC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

CALLAWAY, LAWRENCE C

 

Court Documents

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

07/14/2022:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KINGSLAND INC

07/14/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KINGSLAND INC

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR KINGSLAND INC

07/12/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR KINGSLAND INC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT KINGSLAND OCALA WATERWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

06/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT KINGSLAND OCALA WATERWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KINGSLAND COUNTRY PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

06/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KINGSLAND COUNTRY PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/22/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/22/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

06/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

06/22/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

11 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

07/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/14/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR KINGSLAND INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/12/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED FOR KINGSLAND INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON DEFT KINGSLAND OCALA WATERWAY OWNERS ASSOCIATION

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/23/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT KINGSLAND COUNTRY PROPERTY OWNERS ASSOCIATION INC

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
7 More Docket Entries
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketPayment received: $480.00 Receipt Number XX 756091

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $480.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
06/22/2022

DocketCase 422022CA001245CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/22/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less