This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 05/24/2019 at 22:33:10 (UTC).

MARCHESE, FRANK VS HINES, STEPHEN KEITH Et Al

Case Summary

On 04/30/2019 MARCHESE, FRANK filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against HINES, STEPHEN KEITH. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is HERNDON, LISA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    04/30/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

HERNDON, LISA

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MARCHESE, FRANK

Defendants

HINES, THOMAS S

HINES, STEPHEN KEITH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

POLAK, NORMAN C.

 

Court Documents

ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEFENDANT THOMAS S HINES AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE 11

08/21/2019:ORDER DENYING MOTION TO STRIKE THE DEFENDANT THOMAS S HINES AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSE 11

RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

12/05/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE

SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON DEFT STEPHEN KEITH HINES

05/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED NOT SERVED ON DEFT STEPHEN KEITH HINES

MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

12/09/2019:MOTION-MOTION TO COMPEL ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFT STEVE HINES

03/30/2020:AMENDED NOTICE OF COMPULSORY PHYSICAL EXAMINATION FILED BY DEFT STEVE HINES

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED BY THOMAS S HINES

05/28/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FILED BY THOMAS S HINES

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

06/10/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

06/10/2019:NOTICE OF APPEARANCE AND DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

06/10/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

06/10/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT THOMAS S HINES

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

08/14/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

05/02/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

05/01/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

04/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

04/30/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

04/30/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

04/30/2019:CIVIL COVER SHEET

0 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/02/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY PLTF FRANK MARCHESE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Payment received: $420.00 Receipt Number XX 426002

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/01/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $420.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/30/2019
  • Case 422019CA000951CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 4/30/2019

    Read MoreRead Less