This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 08/23/2022 at 22:34:46 (UTC).

Magerick, LLC VS ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/30/2022 Magerick, LLC filed a Property - Foreclosure lawsuit against ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/30/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Foreclosure

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

Magerick, LLC

Defendants

ANY AND ALL UNKNOWN PARTIES CL

THE UNKNOWN SPOUSE HEIRS DEVIS

UNKNOWN SPOUSE OF BARBARA BRIG

Capital One Bank USA NA

UNKNOWN TENANT 1

UNKNOWN TENANT 2

BRIGMAN, BARBARA

BRIGMAN, JACK DANIEL

Not Classified By Court

UNDER AND AGAINST THE HEREIN N

DEFENDANT S WHO ARE NOT KNOWN

WHETHER SAID UNKNOWN PARTIES M

AS SPOUSE HEIRS HEIRS OF THE N

DEVISEES GRANTEES BENEFICIARIE

GRANTEES ASSIGNEES LIENORS CRE

ANS ALL OTHER PARTIES CLAIMING

BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST TH

JERRY WAYNE BRIGMAN DECEASED

THE NAMES BEING FICTITIOUS TO

IN POSSESSION

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WALDMAN, DAMIAN GEORGE

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

08/02/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/30/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/30/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED LIS PENDENS

07/30/2022:EFILED LIS PENDENS

RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

07/30/2022:RPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

07/30/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

7 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/02/2022
View Court Documents

DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2022

DocketPayment received: $980.00 Receipt Number XX 767059

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
08/01/2022

DocketJudge: Assigned

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
3 More Docket Entries
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED SUMMONS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketRPF VALUE CLAIM FORM

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022
View Court Documents

DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022

DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $980.00

[+] Read More [-] Read Less
07/30/2022

DocketCase 422022CA001557CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/30/2022

[+] Read More [-] Read Less