This case was last updated from Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County on 04/15/2019 at 21:37:24 (UTC).

MACIAS, JOSEPH VS ANDRES HOME IMPROVEMENT Et Al

Case Summary

On 12/06/2018 MACIAS, JOSEPH filed a Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle lawsuit against ANDRES HOME IMPROVEMENT. This case was filed in Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is SCOTT, EDWARD L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/06/2018

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Personal Injury - Motor Vehicle

  • Court:

    Fifth Circuit Courts - Marion County

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

SCOTT, EDWARD L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

MACIAS, JOSEPH

Defendants

TUCKER, MICHAEL ANTHONY

DHANIRAM, PARMANAND

AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

BURKE, CRYSTAL GAIL

ANDRES HOME IMPROVEMENT

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

ROTSTEIN, JONATHAN ISAAC

Defendant Attorneys

PORTIS, SENOVIA ALICIA LANCE

COLEMAN, CHRISTOPHER CHARLES

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

03/18/2019:NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL A TUCKER

03/01/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL A TUCKER

NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFTS

02/26/2019:NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFTS

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

02/25/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL GAIL BURKE

02/20/2019:RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL GAIL BURKE

NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

02/08/2019:NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS PARMANAND DHANIRAM AND ANDRES HOME IMPROVEMENT

02/01/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFTS PARMANAND DHANIRAM AND ANDRES HOME IMPROVEMENT

REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

01/24/2019:REPLY TO AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

01/24/2019:NOTICE OF SERVING INTERROGATORIES FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL G BURKE AND MICHAEL A TUCKER

01/17/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL G BURKE AND MICHAEL A TUCKER

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

01/09/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

01/09/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

01/02/2019:REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

01/02/2019:ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

12/18/2018:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

EFILED SUMMONS

12/06/2018:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

12/06/2018:PETITION/COMPLAINT

CIVIL COVER SHEET

12/06/2018:CIVIL COVER SHEET

48 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF SERVICE OF PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF JOSEPH MACIAS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF ANSWERS TO INTERROGATORIES FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL A TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT MICHAEL A TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/01/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST TO PRODUCE FILED BY DEFT CRYSTAL G BURKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/26/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF UNAVAILABILITY FILED BY DEFTS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFT AUTO OWNERS INSURANCE COMPANY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL GAIL BURKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RESPONSE TO REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL GAIL BURKE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 02/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • REQUEST FOR COPIES FILED BY DEFTS CRYSTAL G BURKE AND MICHAEL A TUCKER

    Read MoreRead Less
44 More Docket Entries
  • 12/07/2018
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • View Court Documents
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $450.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/06/2018
  • Case 422018CA002500CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/6/2018

    Read MoreRead Less