This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 21:32:39 (UTC).

LVNV FUNDING LLC VS WILLIAMS, CYNTHIA

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 LVNV FUNDING LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, CYNTHIA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are ROBERT LANDT, LANDT, ROBERT E and LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

ROBERT LANDT

LANDT, ROBERT E

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LVNV FUNDING LLC

Defendant

WILLIAMS, CYNTHIA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

SCHERR, HAROLD EARL

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CYNTHIA WILLIAMS

09/25/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CYNTHIA WILLIAMS

SUMMONS ISSUED

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

09/21/2020:EFILED SUMMONS

STATEMENT OF CLAIM

09/21/2020:STATEMENT OF CLAIM

CIVIL COVER SHEET

09/21/2020:CIVIL COVER SHEET

 

Docket Entries

  • 11/10/2020
  • HearingEvent Date: 11/10/2020 13:00; Judge: LANDT, ROBERT E; Docket Type: SC PTC; Location: JUDICIAL CENTER ELECTR

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/25/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CYNTHIA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/23/2020
  • DocketActive Process PTC disposition on 09/23/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • DocketEvent SC PTC scheduled on 11/10/2020 at 0100 PM - Judge ROBERT LANDT presiding.

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSTATEMENT OF CLAIM

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $185.00 Receipt Number XX 566231

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $185.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC003099SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 9/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less