This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 04/18/2022 at 23:33:10 (UTC).

LUDWIG, JANE VS JOHN DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT I Et Al

Case Summary

On 03/25/2022 LUDWIG, JANE filed an Other lawsuit against JOHN DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT I. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III and THOMPSON, THOMAS P III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/25/2022

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LUDWIG, JANE

Defendants

REDFORD, MARY ELIZABETH

REDFORD, BERNARD

VOLT, GERALD

JOHN DOE AS UNKNOWN OCCUPANT I

Not Classified By Court

COLLIER, MARY ELIZABETH

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MCMURRAY, JUSTIN SCUTT WARREN

 

Court Documents

CIVIL COVER SHEET

03/25/2022:CIVIL COVER SHEET

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/25/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

EFILED SUMMONS

03/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

03/25/2022:EFILED SUMMONS

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/30/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketANSWER/RESPONSE-ANSWER AND AFFIRMATIVE DEFENSES FILED BY DEFT REDFORD

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $4.00 Receipt Number XX 736761

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/18/2022
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/30/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketPayment received: $340.00 Receipt Number XX 729650

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/28/2022
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $340.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CC000363CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/25/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less