This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/20/2019 at 14:04:38 (UTC).

LONG, CHARLES VS WILLIAMS, TIANNA

Case Summary

On 03/12/2019 LONG, CHARLES filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against WILLIAMS, TIANNA. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/12/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LONG, CHARLES

Defendant

WILLIAMS, TIANNA

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

JONES, RONALD A

 

Court Documents

NOTICE OF HEARING

04/17/2019:NOTICE OF HEARING

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

04/16/2019:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

04/16/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

ORDER

04/09/2019:ORDER

MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CHARLES LONG

03/28/2019:MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CHARLES LONG

EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

03/25/2019:EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

03/25/2019:ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

03/15/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

03/15/2019:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/13/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

CERTIFICATE

03/12/2019:CERTIFICATE

EFILED SUMMONS

03/12/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

03/12/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

1 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/17/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • NOTICE OF HEARING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Payment received: $1,200.25 Receipt Number XX 421557

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/16/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $1,200.25

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/09/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ORDER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF CHARLES LONG

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EVICTION SUMMONS POSTED ON DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • ANSWER/RESPONSE- ANSWER FILED BY DEFT TIANNA WILLIAMS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/25/2019
  • Payment received: $0.30 Receipt Number XX 414026

    Read MoreRead Less
1 More Docket Entries
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/15/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/13/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 410592

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • Case 422019SC001184SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 3/12/2019

    Read MoreRead Less