This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 04/25/2019 at 22:14:48 (UTC).

LEWANDO-BRYERS, LILLIAN ANNE VS BRYERS, ROBERT MARK

Case Summary

On 03/06/2019 LEWANDO-BRYERS, LILLIAN ANNE filed an Other - Name Change lawsuit against BRYERS, ROBERT MARK. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are BASS, JENNIFER and CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    03/06/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Other - Name Change

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

BASS, JENNIFER

CRAGGS, ANN MELINDA

 

Party Details

Petitioner

LEWANDO-BRYERS, LILLIAN ANNE

Respondent

BRYERS, ROBERT MARK

Not Classified By Court

BRYERS, ROBERT M

LEWANDO, LILLIAN ANNE

BRYERS, LILLIAN ANNE

BRYERS, KATHLEEN LEWANDO

Court Documents

Court documents are not available for this case.

 

Docket Entries

  • 04/15/2019
  • COPY OF:LETTERS FROM DEPT OF SOCIAL SERVICES, NY AND SCHOOL LETTER RE: HONOR SOCIETY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2019
  • CORRESPONDENCE OR MEMORANDUM FROM KATHLEEN LEWANDO-BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • EMAIL ADDRESS CHANGE-LILLIAN LEWANDO-BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • DEFAULT ENTERED AGAINST ROBERT BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • MOTION FOR DEFAULT- LILLIAN LEWANDI BRYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/28/2019
  • MOTION-FOR ORDER SETTING FINAL HEARING/NON-JURY TRIAL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • MOTION- FOR TESTIMONY AND ATTENDANCE OF MINOR CHILD(REN) FILED BY KATHLEEN BRYES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/20/2019
  • Judge: CRAGGS , ANN MELINDA Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/12/2019
  • SHERIFFS RETURN OF SERVICE-SERVED ROBERT BRYERS ON MARCH 8, 2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DESIGNATION OF CURRENT MAILING AND EMAIL ADDRESS - LILLIAN LEWANDO-BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • NOTICE OF RELATED CASES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • COPY OF FLORIDA DRIVERS LICENSE - LILLIAN LEWANDO-BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • DISCLOSURE FROM NON-LAWYER

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • APPLICATION FOR INDIGENCY APPROVED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • SUMMONS ISSUED - ROBERT BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • CIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR CHANGE OF NAME (MINOR CHILD(REN)) - KATHLEEN LEWANDO-BRYERS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/06/2019
  • Case 422019DR000876DRAXXX Filed with Clerk on 03/06/2019

    Read MoreRead Less