This case was last updated from Marion County Florida Courts on 12/31/2020 at 23:37:20 (UTC).

LEASE CORPORATION OF AMERICA VS ARRIAGA, RENE

Case Summary

On 12/07/2020 LEASE CORPORATION OF AMERICA filed an Other - Other Judgment lawsuit against ARRIAGA, RENE. This case was filed in Marion County Florida Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS, SARAH and WILLIAMS, SARAH RITTERHOFF. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    12/07/2020

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Other - Other Judgment

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

RITTERHOFF-WILLIAMS, SARAH

WILLIAMS, SARAH RITTERHOFF

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

LEASE CORPORATION OF AMERICA

Defendant

ARRIAGA, RENE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MACCARI, THOMAS JEFFREY

 

Court Documents

FOREIGN JUDGMENT

12/07/2020:FOREIGN JUDGMENT

AFFIDAVIT-AFFIDAVIT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

12/07/2020:AFFIDAVIT-AFFIDAVIT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

12/07/2020:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

12/10/2020:NOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

RECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL

12/11/2020:RECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL

SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

12/15/2020:SUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

 

Docket Entries

  • 12/15/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUGGESTION OF BANKRUPTCY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/11/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRECEIPT FOR REGISTERED MAIL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF RECORDING FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $64.24 Receipt Number XX 589455

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 5 assessed at sum $35.50

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 4 assessed at sum $15.74

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $2.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $4.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $7.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/10/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAFFIDAVIT-AFFIDAVIT OF FOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketFOREIGN JUDGMENT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 12/07/2020
  • DocketCase 422020CC001184CCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 12/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where Lease Corporation of America is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer THOMAS JEFFREY MACCARI