This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 09/23/2021 at 15:46:41 (UTC).

LAMP, FRED Et Al VS AINSWORTH, BARBARA M Et Al

Case Summary

On 07/20/2021 LAMP, FRED filed a Property - Other Real Property lawsuit against AINSWORTH, BARBARA M. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    07/20/2021

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Property - Other Real Property

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiffs

LAMP, FRED

LAMP, JANET

Defendants

AINSWORTH, BARBARA M

MORGAN, STEVEN

MORGAN, MYRA

NEELY, DONALD

NEELY, SHIRLEY

BROWN, MICHAEL

BROWN, KAREN

Not Classified By Court

IF ALIVE OR IF DEAD THEIR UNKN

IF ANY AND ALL OTHER PERSONS O

BY THROUGH UNDER OR AGAINST SA

UNKNOWN NATURAL PERSONS IF ALI

NOT KNOWN TO BE DEAD OR ALIVE

RESPECTIVE UNKNOWN SPOUSES HEI

AND CREDITORS OR OTHER PARTIES

OR UNDER THOSE UNKNOWN NATURAL

SEVERAL AND RESPECTIVE UNKNOWN

SUCCESSORS IN INTEREST TRUSTEE

OR ENTITY NAMED AS A DEFENDANT

5 More Parties Available

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WILSON, ROBERT DOUGLAS

 

Court Documents

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED SUMMONS

07/20/2021:EFILED SUMMONS

EFILED LIS PENDENS

07/20/2021:EFILED LIS PENDENS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

07/20/2021:PETITION/COMPLAINT

MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM

09/14/2021:MOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM

NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY DEFTS DONALD NEELY AND SHIRLEY A NEELY

09/14/2021:NOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY DEFTS DONALD NEELY AND SHIRLEY A NEELY

CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ACTION

09/08/2021:CERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ACTION

NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILING PROCESS

09/08/2021:NOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILING PROCESS

CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF FRED AND JANET LAMP

09/07/2021:CORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF FRED AND JANET LAMP

DEFAULT ENTERED

09/03/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

DEFAULT ENTERED

09/03/2021:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION

08/31/2021:EFILED NOTICE OF ACTION

AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

08/31/2021:AFFIDAVIT OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE OF CONSTRUCTIVE SERVICE

22 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketKAREN BROWN dismissed 09/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • DocketMICHAEL BROWN dismissed 09/14/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO APPOINT AD LITEM

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/14/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF DROPPING PARTY FILED BY DEFTS DONALD NEELY AND SHIRLEY A NEELY

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCERTIFICATE OF SERVICE FOR NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/08/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF ACTION ISSUED MAILING PROCESS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/07/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO TO CLERKS OFFICE FILED BY PLTF FRED AND JANET LAMP

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/03/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketDEFAULT ENTERED

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 08/31/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED NOTICE OF ACTION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
20 More Docket Entries
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED LIS PENDENS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $475.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 07/20/2021
  • DocketCase 422021CA001345CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 7/20/2021

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less