This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 10/14/2020 at 21:33:20 (UTC).

KPC INVESTMENTS INCORPORATED VS HUBBARD, CHRISTINA JO Et Al

Case Summary

On 09/21/2020 KPC INVESTMENTS INCORPORATED filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against HUBBARD, CHRISTINA JO. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are THOMPSON, THOMAS P III and THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    09/21/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

THOMPSON, THOMAS P III

THOMPSON, THOMAS PETER III

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KPC INVESTMENTS INCORPORATED

Defendants

HUBBARD, CHRISTINA JO

HUBBARD, CHRISTOPHER LEE

 

Court Documents

PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

10/02/2020:PROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

10/02/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION- MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR TENANT EVICTION FILED BY PLTF

10/02/2020:MOTION- MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR TENANT EVICTION FILED BY PLTF

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS CHRISTOPHER AND CHRISTINA HUBBARD

10/01/2020:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS CHRISTOPHER AND CHRISTINA HUBBARD

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTINA JO HUBBARD

09/24/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTINA JO HUBBARD

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTOPHER LEE HUBBARD

09/24/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTOPHER LEE HUBBARD

CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

09/22/2020:CORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

09/22/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED W/CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

RECEIPT-FILING FEES

09/21/2020:RECEIPT-FILING FEES

SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

09/21/2020:SERVICE INFORMATION SHEET EMAIL

EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

09/21/2020:EVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

RESIDENTIAL LEASE

09/21/2020:RESIDENTIAL LEASE

EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

09/21/2020:EVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND FOR DAMAGES

09/21/2020:PETITION/COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND FOR DAMAGES

3 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 10/12/2020
  • DocketEFILED ORDER DENYING PLNTF/LANDLORDS MOTIONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPROPOSED WRIT TO BE ISSUED BY CLERK

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/02/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION TO STRIKE DEFENDANTS ANSWER AND FOR DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR TENANT EVICTION FILED BY PLTF

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 10/01/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFTS CHRISTOPHER AND CHRISTINA HUBBARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTINA JO HUBBARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR CHRISTOPHER LEE HUBBARD

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/24/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 09/24/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/22/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCORR/MEMO FROM CLERKS OFFICE

    Read MoreRead Less
4 More Docket Entries
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION INFORMATION SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketRESIDENTIAL LEASE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION NOTICE - 3 DAYS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT FOR EVICTION AND FOR DAMAGES

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $334.00 Receipt Number XX 566032

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 3 assessed at sum $14.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $300.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 09/21/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC003089SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 09/21/2020

    Read MoreRead Less