This case was last updated from Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court on 10/27/2022 at 04:00:49 (UTC).

KING, CRAIG VS HERZKA, YISROEL Et Al

Case Summary

On 02/24/2022 KING, CRAIG filed a Contract - Professional Negligence lawsuit against HERZKA, YISROEL. This case was filed in Marion County - Fifth Judicial Circuit Court, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are SANDERS, GARY LAMAR and SANDERS, GARY L. The case status is Disposed - Other Disposed.
Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    02/24/2022

  • Case Status:

    Disposed - Other Disposed

  • Case Type:

    Contract - Professional Negligence

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

SANDERS, GARY LAMAR

SANDERS, GARY L

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KING, CRAIG

Defendants

TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS LLC

IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP LLC

HERZKA, YISROEL

TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDING

Not Classified By Court

AS PERSONAL REPRESENTATIVE OF

HOWARD KING,

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

BREVDA, DAVID JAMES

 

Court Documents

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OR TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC

03/09/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED OR TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

REQUEST TO PRODUCE

02/24/2022:REQUEST TO PRODUCE

REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

02/24/2022:REQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

02/24/2022:PETITION/COMPLAINT

NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

09/22/2022:NOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

09/22/2022:NOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

NOTICE OF SERING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

05/18/2022:NOTICE OF SERING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

AGREED ORDER ON DEFT TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

05/02/2022:AGREED ORDER ON DEFT TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION FILED BY CRAIG KING

04/19/2022:NOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION FILED BY CRAIG KING

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

04/19/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

04/08/2022:ORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

MOTION-MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFT TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC

03/25/2022:MOTION-MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFT TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON YISROEL HERZKA

03/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON YISROEL HERZKA

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP LLC

03/23/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP LLC

NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

03/11/2022:NOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS LLC

03/09/2022:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS LLC

SUMMONS ISSUED

02/28/2022:SUMMONS ISSUED

23 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF VOLUNTARY DISMISSAL WITH PREJUDICE FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 09/22/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/18/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF SERING PROPOSAL FOR SETTLEMENT FILED BY PLTF CRAIG KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 05/02/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketAGREED ORDER ON DEFT TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF CANCELLATION OF MEDIATION FILED BY CRAIG KING

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/19/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketNOTICE OF MEDIATION CONFERENCE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 04/08/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketORDER TO RESPOND AND ORDER ESTABLISHING MOTION PRACTICE PROCEDURE

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/25/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketMOTION-MOTION TO STAY AND COMPEL ARBITRATION FILED BY DEFT TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS HOLDINGS LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED ON YISROEL HERZKA

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 03/23/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP LLC

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
19 More Docket Entries
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketREQUEST FOR ADMISSIONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $440.00

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
  • 02/24/2022
  • DocketCase 422022CA000344CAAXXX Filed with Clerk on 2/24/2022

    [+] Read More [-] Read Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where IMPERIAL HEALTHCARE GROUP, LLC is a litigant

Latest cases where TIMBERRIDGE OPERATIONS LLC is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer BREVDA , DAVID J