This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 07/14/2020 at 16:35:53 (UTC).

KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES, LLC VS BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC Et Al

Case Summary

On 01/13/2020 KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES, LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judges overseeing this case are LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD and LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    01/13/2020

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judges

LANDT, ROBERT EDWARD

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES, LLC

Defendants

HOWELL, WILLA BASS

BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

MANTONI, JENNIFER LYNN

 

Court Documents

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

08/03/2020:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

DEFAULT ENTERED

08/03/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES LLC

08/12/2020:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT JUDGMENT CONT SEE DOC FILED BY PLTF KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES LLC

DEFAULT ENTERED

08/05/2020:DEFAULT ENTERED

EFILED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

09/30/2020:EFILED CERTIFICATE OF TITLE

EFILED CERTIFICATE OF SALE

09/30/2020:EFILED CERTIFICATE OF SALE

CERTIFICATE OF SALE

09/30/2020:CERTIFICATE OF SALE

AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES LLC

09/29/2020:AFFIDAVIT AS TO ATTORNEY FEES AND COSTS FILED BY PLTF KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES LLC

PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

09/14/2020:PROOF OF PUBLICATION NOTICE OF SALE

CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR MONEY DAMAGES SUBORDINATIONA OF FIRST LIEN AND IMPOSITION AND FORECLOSURE OF STATUTORY LANDLORDS LIEN

08/26/2020:CLS: DEFAULT FINAL JUDGMENT FOR MONEY DAMAGES SUBORDINATIONA OF FIRST LIEN AND IMPOSITION AND FORECLOSURE OF STATUTORY LANDLORDS LIEN

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WILLA BASS HOWELL

05/13/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WILLA BASS HOWELL

EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

04/29/2020:EFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC

04/08/2020:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC

SUMMONS ISSUED

03/31/2020:SUMMONS ISSUED

MOTION- MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY PLTF KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES LLC

03/14/2020:MOTION- MOTION FOR LEAVE TO AMEND FILED BY PLTF KEYSTONE DOGWOOD ACRES LLC

WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT WILLA BASS HOWELL

02/21/2020:WRIT OF POSSESSION EXECUTED ON DEFT WILLA BASS HOWELL

EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

02/11/2020:EFILED WRIT OF POSSESSION

MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

02/05/2020:MAIL RETURNED BY POST OFFICE

17 More Documents Available

 

Docket Entries

  • 05/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR WILLA BASS HOWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 05/07/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 05/07/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/29/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED MOTION FOR DEFAULT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 04/08/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/31/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $20.00 Receipt Number XX 522932

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 03/30/2020
  • DocketAssessment 2 assessed at sum $20.00

    Read MoreRead Less
18 More Docket Entries
  • 01/14/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEVICTION SUMMONS POSTED FOR WILLA BASS HOWELL

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/14/2020
  • DocketActive Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 01/14/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketSUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketPETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketEFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • View Court Documents
  • DocketCIVIL COVER SHEET

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketPayment received: $310.00 Receipt Number XX 499880

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketAssessment 1 assessed at sum $310.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketJudge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 01/13/2020
  • DocketCase 422020SC000159SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 1/13/2020

    Read MoreRead Less
related-case-search

Dig Deeper

Get Deeper Insights on Court Cases


Latest cases where BOMBARDIER CAPITAL INC. is a litigant

Latest cases represented by Lawyer MANTONI, JENNIFER