This case was last updated from Marion County Courts on 07/08/2019 at 21:33:56 (UTC).

JUNEGLOBAL LLC VS DAVIS, RICHAE

Case Summary

On 06/14/2019 JUNEGLOBAL LLC filed a Small Claim - Other Small Claim lawsuit against DAVIS, RICHAE. This case was filed in Marion County Courts, Marion County Judicial Center located in Marion, Florida. The Judge overseeing this case is LANDT, ROBERT E. The case status is Pending - Other Pending.

Case Details Parties Documents Dockets

 

Case Details

  • Case Number:

    ****************AXXX

  • Filing Date:

    06/14/2019

  • Case Status:

    Pending - Other Pending

  • Case Type:

    Small Claim - Other Small Claim

  • Court:

    Marion County Courts

  • Courthouse:

    Marion County Judicial Center

  • County, State:

    Marion, Florida

Judge Details

Judge

LANDT, ROBERT E

 

Party Details

Plaintiff

JUNEGLOBAL LLC

Defendant

DAVIS, RICHAE

Attorney/Law Firm Details

Plaintiff Attorney

WOLK, BRIAN PETER

 

Court Documents

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH DISBURSEMENT REVISED FILED BY PLTF JUNEGLOBAL LLC

06/27/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH DISBURSEMENT REVISED FILED BY PLTF JUNEGLOBAL LLC

SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RICHAE DAVIS

06/27/2019:SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RICHAE DAVIS

MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF JUNEGLOBAL LLC

06/27/2019:MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF JUNEGLOBAL LLC

RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

06/27/2019:RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT RICHAE DAVIS

06/25/2019:MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT RICHAE DAVIS

CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

06/20/2019:CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

SUMMONS ISSUED

06/18/2019:SUMMONS ISSUED

EFILED SUMMONS

06/14/2019:EFILED SUMMONS

CERTIFICATE

06/14/2019:CERTIFICATE

DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

06/14/2019:DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

PETITION/COMPLAINT

06/14/2019:PETITION/COMPLAINT

 

Docket Entries

  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT WITH DISBURSEMENT REVISED FILED BY PLTF JUNEGLOBAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS RETURNED SERVED FOR RICHAE DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION-MOTION FOR DEFAULT AND DEFAULT JUDGMENT FILED BY PLTF JUNEGLOBAL LLC

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • RECEIPT-FUNDS INTO REGISTRY

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Payment received: $412.00 Receipt Number XX 442782

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 3 assessed at sum $12.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/27/2019
  • Assessment 2 assessed at sum $400.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/25/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • MOTION- MOTION FILED BY DEFT RICHAE DAVIS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/20/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE OF MAILING

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/19/2019
  • Active Process CIVIL SUMMONS disposition on 06/19/2019

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/18/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • SUMMONS ISSUED

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Payment received: $195.00 Receipt Number XX 439607

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/17/2019
  • Judge: Assigned

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • EFILED SUMMONS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • CERTIFICATE

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • DESIGNATION OF EMAIL ADDRESS

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • View Court Documents
  • PETITION/COMPLAINT

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Assessment 1 assessed at sum $195.00

    Read MoreRead Less
  • 06/14/2019
  • Case 422019SC002973SCAXXX Filed with Clerk on 6/14/2019

    Read MoreRead Less